Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nicholas Love, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cruikshank, Allan Baldwin, against Autumn M Love, represented by Neverett, Meredith Ann, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Timothy Lawliss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Lawliss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE Sealed |
||
March 31, 2021 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Sealed |
||
March 31, 2021 |
QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER Sealed |
||
March 26, 2021 |
QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER (PROPOSED) Sealed |
||
March 24, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Sealed |
||
March 16, 2021 |
DECISION AFTER TRIAL Sealed |
||
March 11, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Sealed |
||
March 11, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Sealed |
||
March 04, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Sealed |
||
February 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.