Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hamilton Funeral Home, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Walter, Lanny Earl, against Cyndi L. Lamb, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts Clinton County Supreme Court with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseClinton County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time130 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
July 01, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
May 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 11, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 05, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 29, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.