Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2017 |
CategoryUncontested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time205 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISMISSED LAWLISS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
January 04, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) LAWLISS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
December 30, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) LAWLISS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
December 05, 2016 | Motion |
DISMISS FAILURE TO FILE NECESS (Motion #002) Decided: 01/04/2017GRANTED Before Justice: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
December 05, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) LAWLISS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
July 08, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) LAWLISS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
July 07, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) LAWLISS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
June 13, 2016 | Motion |
PP APP (Motion #001) Decided: 07/08/2016GRNTD Before Justice: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
|
June 13, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) LAWLISS (Motion Part) Judge: HON. TIMOTHY J. LAWLISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.