Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Samantha B Zaber, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) Mailed to defendant 10/31/2022 |
||
October 04, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 04, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing |
||
September 12, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.