Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anthony B Crothers, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Eisenhut, Clifford Craig, against Deborah W Crothers, represented by Egitton, Amy B., in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 16, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
February 15, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
February 09, 2023 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 12, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
January 10, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 30, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 01, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 01, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
November 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.