Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Stephanie P Hughes, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
November 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 08, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 12, 2022 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) Mailed out on 9/12/2022 |
||
August 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 31, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice |
||
August 11, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Charge Off |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.