Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Brett A Gates, represented by Fowlkes, William Y., Reilly, Joseph John, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 20, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) | ||
September 13, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
September 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 06, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 20, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
July 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.