Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Haley Utter, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Distefano, Diane Marie, against Aaron Utter, represented by Battisti, Francis Paul, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 07, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 21, 2022 | ORDER - INTERIM | ||
December 14, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 13, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 02, 2022 | ORDER (AMENDED) | ||
October 27, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 27, 2022 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 18, 2022 | ORDER - INTERIM | ||
August 18, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.