Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Melissa D. Vroman, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mccabe-Szczepanski, Michelle Cathleen, against Joshua M. Vroman, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
April 15, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
April 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
April 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
March 11, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 08, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
March 08, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
March 08, 2022 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.