Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Michelle Settle, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER 2 AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 09, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* DEBT SELLER 1 AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
September 09, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER 2 AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER 2 AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
June 02, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
June 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
June 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
June 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
June 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* DEBT SELLER 1 AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER 1 AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
June 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
June 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
December 01, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to Defendant on 12/1/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.