Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
David K Collar, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by O'Hara, Keith Andrew, against Edna D Slaucenburg, Michael E Slaucenburg, represented by Assaf, Michael David, Chamberlain, James Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Constructive Trust) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 26, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT *Corrected* Continuation of Trial |
||
July 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Trial Memorandum of Law on Pro Se Defendants |
||
July 14, 2023 | TRIAL MEMORANDUM | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (attachment)Amended Verified Answer and Counterclaims |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (attachment) Amended Complaint |
||
June 07, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (attachment) Reply to Amended Verified Answer and Counterclaims |
||
May 02, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Non-Jury Trial Notice |
||
April 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY for Order signed April 18, 2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.