Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Dennis C Murphy, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: November 03, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 10, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
December 07, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
November 03, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to Defendant on 11/3/2021 |
||
October 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 10, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 16, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q60685688694 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.