Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Shawn D Wallace, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 24, 2021 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
September 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 30, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to Defendant on 7/30/2021 |
||
July 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 15, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
June 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C CHARGE OFF |
||
June 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.