Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laurie Franklin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Distefano, Diane Marie, against George Franklin, represented by Abbott, Rachel Ann, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
November 09, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
October 06, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 05, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
October 05, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
October 05, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
September 29, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
September 29, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
August 31, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.