Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Jakas, Joseph Karl, Powell, Larry T, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Linda M Burke, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 30, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 09, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
November 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation |
||
November 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
November 09, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice |
||
November 09, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
||
November 09, 2022 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
July 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
July 29, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 21, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.