Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Jeffrey B Franklin, Macie R Franklin, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 18, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: December 15, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 03, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 03, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 03, 2021EXECUTION
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 03, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 03, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2022 |
EXECUTION Income Execution Unsatisfied |
||
December 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
December 15, 2021 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
December 15, 2021 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
December 15, 2021 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
December 03, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit of Mailing - Jeffrey B Franklin |
||
December 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service |
||
December 03, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Assigned RJI |
||
December 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Fees Listing |
||
December 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Military Search |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.