Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Preferred Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Felter, Karen Guyder, Gaetano, Joseph Anthony, against Devin M. Harkins, James J. Parkhurst In His Representative Capacity, As Parent And Guardian, On Behalf Of M.P. And M.J.P., Infants, John Or Jane Doe Administrator Of The Estate Of Cynthia Harkins, Kingston Fraternal Youth Babe Ruth League, Inc., Kingston Youth Baseball & Softball Association, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Shafran, Howard Evan, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: May 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 25, 2023 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
April 24, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 28, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT (Motion #1) Notice of Motion with Court assigned return date |
||
November 28, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Daniel J. Hernandez letter(s) dated December 9, 2020 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Daniel J. Hernandez letter(s) dated December 9, 2020 Redacted |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Howard Shafran, Esq. letter dated November 23, 2020 & Joseph OConnor, Esq. letter dated November 9, Howard Shafran, Esq. letter dated November 23, 2020 & Joseph OConnor, Esq. letter dated November 9, ... show more |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Homeowners Policy of Insurance |
||
November 18, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 18, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.