Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Maxx A Waters, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
August 24, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215g |
||
August 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice |
||
August 24, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
August 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 24, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
||
August 24, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
August 24, 2021 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
July 20, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to Defendant on 7/20/2021 |
||
January 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE MAXX A WATERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.