Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cny Power Sports Llc D B A Cny Farm Supply, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ross, Joel Ian, Shaw, Amanda C, against Robert Campbell, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 25, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter requesting dismissal without prejudice |
||
October 25, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Appearance notice |
||
April 11, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Decision + Order on Motion, Entered by County Clerk |
||
April 11, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 16, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 15, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 04, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT (Motion #3) Notice of Motion with Court assigned return date |
||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) affidavit of service by mail of Notice of Motion |
||
November 03, 2021 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
November 03, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) plaintiff affidavit in support of motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.