Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tina M Cutting, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kilmer, Robert Charles, against Ernest Cutting Jr., represented by Sinicki, Michael Scott, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 14, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 23, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
June 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
June 07, 2022 | COMPLAINT | ||
June 07, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
June 07, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
June 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 06, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 25, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.