Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Second Round Sub Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Stephen I Goodrich Jr, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time22 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 14, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 14, 2020ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: February 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OCA Original Credit Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR OCA Original Credit Affidavit Redacted |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OCA Debt Buyer Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR OCA Debt Buyer Affidavit Redacted |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OCA Debt Seller Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR OCA Debt Seller Affidavit Redacted |
||
January 19, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 19, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 05, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 03, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 14, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
January 14, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.