Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Crystal Jeffers A K A Crystal S Fredenburg, Crystal Jeffers A K A Crystal S Fredenburg, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time11 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: January 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
April 23, 2021 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION Mailed to Defendant on 4/23/2021 |
||
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.