Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Lisa Mulderig, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 28, 2019ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: March 18, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR *Corrected* | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B CLIENT STATEMENT |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.