Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, against Michael L Petchenik, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions89 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time95 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
October 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.