Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, against Juston Spathelf, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions85 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time90 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
October 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.