Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Visions Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Thomas, William Miles, against Timothy L. Stoddard, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions158 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time158 days |
MEMORANDUM
Date: January 08, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Assigned RJI |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B proof of service and mailing |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A summons and complaint |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Second Affidavit of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.