Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fusco, Emma Louise, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Polowy, Amy E., Rosenfeld, Steven, (total of 5) See All against John Doe, People Of The State Of New York, Public Administrator Of Chenango County, As Administrator Cta Of The Estate Of Scott A. Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: January 16, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 17, 2019ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: February 25, 2020ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: February 20, 2020MEMORANDUM
Date: December 19, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected*
Date: January 16, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 05, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Notice of Motion with Return Date |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected* | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected* | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-L Exhibits A-L |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.