Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Phillips, Elliot, Scully, James Paul, against Milton F Welsh, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 13, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 23, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: November 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Service Invoice |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Aff of Non-military |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.