Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Migliaccio, Anthony J, against Bruce Rounds A K A Bruce H Rounds Ii, represented by Khan, Sanna Begum, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time62 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 09, 2019STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: October 09, 2019ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 29, 2019ANSWER
Date: August 29, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Redacted |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-BRUCE ROUNDS A/K/A BRUCE H ROUNDS II-42781949 |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER (AMENDED) | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-BRUCE ROUNDS A/K/A BRUCE H ROUNDS-42616358 |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons + Complaint, Bruce Rounds aka Bruce H Rounds II |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.