Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gina Russo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Distefano, Diane Marie, against Michael Russo, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.