Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Homebridge Financial Services, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Confusione, Lisa M, Fay, Richard Patrick, Jurek, Amber Augustine, against Donald J. Reese, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #20, The Last Twenty Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions223 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: January 09, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
September 01, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 01, 2021 |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Indexed by County Clerk |
||
June 16, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
May 03, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Returned mail - D Reese |
||
January 05, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Reassignment Notice |
||
October 13, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM |
||
September 29, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Default Judgment and Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.