Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Quicken Loans Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against And John Doe And Mary Doe,, Audrey Binkov, Ivan Binkov, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 17, 2019ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2020ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: February 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS |
|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE - OOR |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Assigned RJI |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT AFF IN SUPPORT |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION RJI |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-L A-L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.