Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Sarkis, Andreana Maria, Verhagen, Jason P, Wallace, Stephanie Marie, against T Thurlby Aka T C Thurlby Aka Thomas C Thurlby, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 10, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 30, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Investigation | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215(g) |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) Invoice for Service |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgement |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.