Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chobani Global Holdings, Llc Chobani, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, against The Assessor For The Town Of Norwich; The Board Of Assessment Review For The Town Of Norwich; And The Town Of Norwich In The County Of Chenango, New York, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 14, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 24, 2019STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: October 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.