Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Department Stores Nationalbank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Laura Wilson, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time200 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 05, 2019NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 14, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.