Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Greg Sigman, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Distefano, Diane Marie, against Sarah Sigman, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time179 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.