Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
East Coast Resorts Of America, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Jay M. Orr, Sharon L. Orr, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 06, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions215 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time217 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 06, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B military search D2 |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT non military aff D2 |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A military search D1 |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT non-millitary affidavit D1 |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 3215 mailing d2 |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.