Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ns163, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falkowski, Michal, Richland, Daniel H., against Debra D. Petrick, John Doe No. 1 Through John Doe No. 99, Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises, represented by Kapur, David E., in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Indexed by County Clerk |
||
September 09, 2021 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
August 24, 2021 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
August 16, 2021 | Notice of Sale and Affidavit of Mailing | ||
June 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Sale and Affidavit of Mailing |
||
June 11, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
June 11, 2021 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
June 10, 2021 | Notice of Sale and AoS | ||
May 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Entered by County Clerk |
||
May 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.