Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jacob Lepcio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Natoli, Steven Greig, against Kimberly A Lepcio, represented by Distefano, Diane Marie, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2020 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
February 26, 2020 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
February 25, 2020 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
February 25, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 25, 2020 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT MCBRIDE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JOSEPH A. MCBRIDE |
|
February 19, 2020 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
February 04, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Assigned RJI |
||
February 04, 2020 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
February 04, 2020 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
February 04, 2020 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.