Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against David L Ayers, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 23, 2019JUDGMENT *Corrected*
Date: July 09, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT *Corrected* | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B CLIENT STATEMENT |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A MILITARY AFF |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.