Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Visions Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Thomas, William Miles, against Thomas M. Corigliano, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: May 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 28, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
November 30, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B proof of service and mailing |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Assigned RJI |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A summons and complaint |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Thomas M. Corigliano |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.