Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stacy A Sergent, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Natoli, Steven Greig, against Christopher D Sergent, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts Chenango County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseChenango County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.