Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Rocket Mortgage, Llc F K A Quicken Loans, Llc F K A Quicken Loans, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, Polowy, Amy E., Rooney, Anthony J., against Joanne Stull Individually And As Surviving Spouse Of Lawrence I. Stull, John Doe, Vision Federal Credit Union, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Mary Tarantelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary Tarantelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 29, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 09, 2024NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: December 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 12, 2023 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION | ||
December 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 30, 2023 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order of Reference and Default Judgment |
||
November 29, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 15, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Decision on Motion from Court |
||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) Supplemental affidavit/affirmation Supplemental affidavit/affirmation Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 17, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Independent proof to be submitted by 11/6/23 |
||
June 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.