Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Duane Locke, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT non-military affidavit |
||
April 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION attorney affirmation of facts |
||
April 19, 2023 | affidavit of compliance | ||
April 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION statute of limitations affirmation |
||
March 13, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
March 08, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
March 06, 2023 | Affidavit of Compliance | ||
March 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Retail Installment Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.