Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
David Hadar, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Maggs, Bryan James, against Gregory D. Romulus, Romulus Properties, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Aherne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Rpapl Art.15 Quiet Title) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 18, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation |
||
October 17, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
October 16, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) (Plaintiff to submit proposed Judgment) |
||
October 03, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS (Inquest documents submitted by Pro se Defendants) |
||
September 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 07, 2023 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Inquest scheduled for 10/5/23 at 9:30 a.m. via Teams. Plaintiff's counsel to cause personal service Inquest scheduled for 10/5/23 at 9:30 a.m. via Teams. Plaintiff's counsel to cause personal service ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.