Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Kyle S Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 07, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
January 30, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 30, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 09, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.