Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Branden S. Mulhollen, Emily Ann Mulhollen, John Doe, Mary Doe Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein., Nys Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 6) See All represented by Sroka, Scott Leeson, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Mary Tarantelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary Tarantelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A/B
Date: December 29, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
March 09, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
March 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
March 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EMILY |
||
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS DEPT TAX FINANCE |
||
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANTS |
||
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BRANDEN |
||
January 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HUD- LOCAL SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.