Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cnlrs Exchange I, Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Furey, Raymond Joseph, against The Assessor, The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of Big Flats, The Board Of Assessors, The Town Of Big Flats, represented by Maggs, Bryan James, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 12, 2022PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: July 26, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 03, 2022RJI (AMENDED)
Date: July 26, 2022NOTICE
Date: August 11, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 12, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 12, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1) | ||
August 11, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
August 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 200-0937 DOA AFF |
||
August 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 200-0937 CT AFF |
||
August 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 200-0937 ATTY AFF |
||
August 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 200-0937 SD AFF |
||
July 26, 2022 |
PETITION (AMENDED) 200-0937 AMENDED PETITION |
||
July 26, 2022 |
RJI (AMENDED) 200-0937 Amended RJI |
||
July 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Conformed Notice of Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.