Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tyler Jorge Delgado A Minor, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Domestication Of Order) case represented by Ryan, John Joseph, against Watkins Glen International, represented by Middaugh, Kimberlee Balok, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Domestication Of Order) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
|
RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: June 03, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 10, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Signed OSC |
||
June 09, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 07, 2022 | Affidavit of Service on Attorney for Respondent | ||
June 03, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Domestication of Order |
||
June 03, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 03, 2022 |
PETITION w/Exhibits, Order to Show Cause, Affidavit in Support w/Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.