Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Denise Yost, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
November 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
November 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
November 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
November 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
September 23, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
September 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 13, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 13, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.